Case: 03-95-00043-CR
03-95-00043-CR
01/26/1995
Injury to a Child
Barbara Gail Fuller
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/14/1997 | CASE STORED | | |||
07/30/1996 | Mandate Acknowledgment | | |||
07/09/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/13/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
02/14/1996 | Submitted | | |||
02/14/1996 | Submission | | |||
01/26/1996 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||
01/23/1996 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |||
01/11/1996 | Submission | | |||
07/21/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |||
07/21/1995 | Brief filed | | |||
06/29/1995 | Brief filed | | |||
06/08/1995 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/08/1995 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
06/06/1995 | Affidavit received | | |||
05/22/1995 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
05/16/1995 | Statement of facts overdue | | |||
04/05/1995 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/03/1995 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
03/08/1995 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/07/1995 | Affidavit received | | |||
03/03/1995 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |||
03/02/1995 | Transcript Filed | | |||
03/01/1995 | Letter received | | |||
02/28/1995 | RECORD OVERDUE CRIMINAL | | |||
01/26/1995 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/26/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/09/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Court Of Criminal Appeals | Interested party | The Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr. |
Fuller, Barbara Gail | Appellant | Ms. Mary Kay Sicola |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. C. Bryan Case Jr. The Honorable Ronald Earle |
State Prosecuting Attorney | Interested party | The Honorable Matthew W. Paul |
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Michael F. Lynch
0933141
Ct.I-10 yrs./Ct.II-30 yrs.