Case Information: 85-CV-1198 | |||
Short Caption: | HARPER, T. CLARENCE 1511 K STREET ASSOCIATES | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LT45945-85 | Filed Date: | 08/29/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/29/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/09/1985 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/07/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/17/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | T. Clarence Clarence Harper | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HARPER, T. CLARENCE 1511 K STREET ASSOCIATES | |||
08/29/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
09/09/1985 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/07/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
06/17/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/19/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |