Case Information: 39019 | |||
Short Caption: | NATURE'S BODYCARE VS. LATTINO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A428757 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/11/2002 / Buehler, Brice | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/03/2003 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/03/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Schreck Brignone Godfrey--check no. 022177. | ||
01/03/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 02-00164 | |
01/11/2002 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/22/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-01417 | |
01/24/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Brice Buehler. (Docketing statement) | ||
06/07/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 02-09994 | |
06/21/2002 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 02-10773 | |
07/10/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 19, 2002. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | 02-11763 | |
07/15/2002 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: April 19, 2002. Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. | 02-12083 | |
08/05/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 08/01/02. | 02-13348 | |
08/05/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 02-13349 | |
08/05/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion for Stay, or Alternatively, for Expedited Appeal. | 02-13363 | |
08/13/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Statement of Non-Opposition to Appellant's Alternative Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal. | 02-13857 | |
08/30/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 13, 2002. | 02-15138 | |
09/13/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 09/13/02. | 02-15931 | |
10/11/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 28, 2002. | 02-17642 | |
10/30/2002 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on 10/26/02. | 02-18674 | |
10/30/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. 01/09/03 ORDER: EXHIBIT A ATTACHED TO THE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD ON APPEAL--STRICKEN. | 02-18675 | |
01/09/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We deny appellant's request for a stay of its involvement in the district court proceedings. We grant appellant's alternative request to expedite this appeal. fn1[We note that the district court trial is set to commence on October 7, 2003. In the event that this court does not resolve this appeal by that time, appellant may file another motion for a stay.] This court shall expedite the resolution of the appeal as this court's docket permits. On October 30, 2002, appellant filed a motion to supplement the record. Attached to the motion is a document entitled 'Joint Resolution Written Consent of Directors Australian BodyCare Enterprises, Inc. Nature's BodyCare, Inc.' However, because it appears the proposed attached document was never presented to the district court for its review, we deny the motion to supplement the record. fn2[The clerk of this court shall strike the document attached as Exhibit A to the motion to supplement.] | 03-00493 | |
02/03/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 03-01766 | |
02/03/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB | ||
03/17/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 03-04393 | |
04/11/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-04621 | |
04/11/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/28/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 2003. | 03-04621 |