Case Heading (S-20-0078) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0078 | Case Docketed On: | 04/07/2020 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Teton County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract | ||
Short Title: | THE MATTHEIS COMPANY v. RICHARD J. MULLIGAN, individually, and MULLIGAN LAW OFFICE, PC, a Wyoming corporation | ||||
Full Title: | THE MATTHEIS COMPANY, Appellant (Defendant), v. RICHARD J. MULLIGAN, individually, and MULLIGAN LAW OFFICE, PC, a Wyoming corporation, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | The Mattheis Company | Richard Ray Thomas |
Appellee | Richard J. Mulligan | Billie LM Addleman Erin Elizabeth Berry |
Appellee | Mulligan Law Office, PC | Billie LM Addleman Erin Elizabeth Berry |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Civil Procedure, Professional negligence |
Opinion Number: | 2021 WY 14 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/07/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/07/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/07/2020 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
04/07/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
05/26/2020 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/26/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs | Notice-Incoming | Statement of costs | Final | |
07/02/2020 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
07/06/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Notice of case maturity | Notice-Outgoing | Notice of case maturity | Final | |
07/17/2020 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
07/20/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/03/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
08/03/2020 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volumes 1 and 2 - Original papers | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/11/2020 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
09/23/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Billie LM Addleman obo Appellee (not arguing) | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/23/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Erin Elizabeth Berry obo Appellee (will be arguing) | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/30/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Richard R. Thomas obo appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
10/22/2020 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Richard Ray Thomas obo Appellant; Erin Berry and Billy Addleman obo Appellee with argument by Ms. Berry) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
01/28/2021 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Justice Boomgaarden writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
02/16/2021 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
02/16/2021 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
02/16/2021 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
02/16/2021 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |