Case: 05-90-00931-CV
05-90-00931-CV
08/09/1990
Mandamus
Flores, Rudolph Lance
Theo Bedard, Judge, 330th District Court, Dallas County, Tex
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/05/2002 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
03/05/2002 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
07/11/2001 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
09/10/1990 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/10/1990 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/17/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
08/10/1990 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/09/1990 | MattConv | | |
08/09/1990 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
08/09/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/05/2002 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
330th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Theo L. Bedard
89-01069-Y