judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SCHRAM, KATE MARY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 83-CT-1534
Short Caption:SCHRAM, KATE MARY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T526-83Filed Date:12/22/1983

Opening Event Date:12/22/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/19/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/16/1984
Argued/Submitted:11/13/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen J. O'BrienYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Karen J. Krueger YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SCHRAM, KATE MARY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12/22/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/19/1984FiledRecord Completed
07/16/1984FiledBriefing Completed
11/13/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/31/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition