judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEEKS (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31950
Short Caption:MEEKS (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140314Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/16/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
03/12/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31899, 31901, 31936, 31938, 31947, 31948, 31950.
05/20/1998BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Opening Brief. (received the original only).
07/16/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
07/16/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12067
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13761
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13761