judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AUGER, ULYSSESS G. BAR

Case Information: 82-AA-0123
Short Caption:AUGER, ULYSSESS G. BARClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Board Of Appeals & Review (BAR)
Lead:82-AA-0123Consolidated: 82-CV-0449
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:02/17/1982

Opening Event Date:02/17/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/29/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/1983
Argued/Submitted:04/26/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AUGER, ULYSSESS G. BAR
02/17/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/29/1982FiledRecord Completed
03/09/1983FiledBriefing Completed
04/26/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/30/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition