judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CODY LEE EDWARDS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-25)
Case Number:06-25Case Docketed On:02/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CODY LEE EDWARDS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CODY LEE EDWARDS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCody Lee EdwardsKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 146
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/28/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/28/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/12/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/28/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/29/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
07/31/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
08/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/23/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/24/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/04/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/05/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
01/16/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; volumes II and III, transcripts; volume IV, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, Justice Golden writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/25/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card (Warden)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/08/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card from WardenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/08/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card, from ClerkServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal