Case Information: 83-CT-0980 | |||
Short Caption: | GRIFFIN, JOHN E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | T453-83 | Filed Date: | 08/02/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/02/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 02/07/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/21/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | GRIFFIN, JOHN E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 WHETHER PROCEEDING PRO SE, OR NOTE - 01 WISHES APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL NOTE - 02 1/31/84 ORD: GRANTING APLT'S NOTE - 02 MOTION TO PROCEED ON APPEAL NOTE - 03 IN FORMA PAUPERIS; CLERK OF NOTE - 03 SUPERIOR COURT DIRECTED TO NOTE - 04 TRANSMIT RECORD WITHOUT FEE NOTE - 04 FORTHWITH; THE MATTER OF NOTE - 05 ORDERING RT IS REFERRED TO NOTE - 05 TRIAL JUDGE FOR CONSIDERATION NOTE - 06 UPON FILING OF AN APPROPRIATE NOTE - 06 MOTION IN THAT COURT. NOTE - 07 050985 ORD: GRANT MO & VACATE NOTE - 07 APPOINTMENT OF JOHN P. NOTE - 08 CONNELLY & APPOINT WILLIAM T. NOTE - 08 MORRISON TO REPRESENT APLT; NOTE - 09 NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 09 APLT IN 30 DAYS TO FILE AN NOTE - 10 APPROPRIATE MOTION W/RESPECT NOTE - 10 TO THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 11 091185 ORD: GRANT MO & NOTE - 11 REINSTATE APPEAL; CLERK OF NOTE - 12 SUPER CRT TO TAKE NECESSARY NOTE - 12 STEPS TO HAVE RT TRANSMITTED NOTE - 13 TO THIS CRT; APLT IS DIRECTED NOTE - 13 TO RESPOND TO 5/9/85 ORD 30 NOTE - 14 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. NOTE - 14 | |||
01/01/1906 | CONNELLYJ VACATED - 5/9/85 | |||
08/02/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/15/1983 | LETTER REQUEST APPELLANT TO EXECUTE AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY;TO INFORM THE COURT IN WRITING PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/08/1983 | AFFIDAVIT OF APLT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO PROCEED IN F.P. SL PANEL SCDATE 121583 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
01/31/1984 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 THROUGH 06 CWC PANELKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/07/1984 | RECORD ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 040284 SCHPRD R | |||
02/07/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/17/1984 | SUA SPONTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE APLNT IN 10 DAYS SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF SED PANELNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/24/1984 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER OF 7/17/84 MLH PANEL SCDATE 072784 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
08/02/1984 | ORDER DIRECTING APLNT TO FILE BRIEF IN 30 DAYS OR APPEAL SHALL BE DISMISSED. NFX SED PANELPRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/11/1984 | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 090184 SCHPRD BA | |||
11/05/1984 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/26/1984 | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT FOR LEAVE TO TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (MOTION FILED WITHIN) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/21/1985 | ORDER APPOINT JOHN P. CONNELLY; COUNSEL TO FL MO FOR RECNDRATN TO 10/11/84 ORD IN 30 DAYS. PANELPY SCDATE 120684 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
04/03/1985 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/09/1985 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM MORRISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/09/1985 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-10 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 040485 SCHPRD RBH | |||
06/10/1985 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT'S ATTY FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EVALUATE APPEALABLE ISSUES FOR 30 DAYS GG PANEL SCDATE 052085 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
09/11/1985 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11-14 ACG PANELMKNW SCDATE 081585 SCHPRD VS | |||
10/09/1987 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (61 PGS - MOORE) PB PANEL SCDATE 011587 SCHPRD RT | |||
10/22/1987 | ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 30 DAYS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO 5/9/85 ORD. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
11/30/1987 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF WILLIAM T. MORRISON AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/04/1987 | LETTER ANDERS LETTER TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 1/4/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD DAS | |||
03/31/1988 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING MO TO W/DRAW & AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL ACG PANELNWRO SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD VS | |||
03/31/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
04/21/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |