Case: 05-01-00629-CV
05-01-00629-CV
04/18/2001
Miscellaneous civil
Johnny Spencer
James W. Brown, Deville Homes, Inc. and Pat Doak
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/14/2019 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
10/28/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/03/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/26/2002 | Notice received | | |||
06/11/2002 | Petition for Writ Mandamus | | |||
05/24/2002 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
02/07/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
02/07/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/22/2002 | Amended Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/17/2002 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
10/30/2001 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
10/30/2001 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
10/30/2001 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
10/29/2001 | Submission | | |||
10/29/2001 | Submitted | | |||
10/23/2001 | $125 2nd notice sent on fee due | | |||
10/08/2001 | Notice Filed | | |||
09/24/2001 | Brief Received | | |||
09/24/2001 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
09/21/2001 | Brief Received | | |||
09/21/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
09/18/2001 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
09/17/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
09/17/2001 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
09/07/2001 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
09/07/2001 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
08/30/2001 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
08/29/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
08/24/2001 | Docketing Statement Received | | |||
08/24/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
08/08/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
08/01/2001 | Notice Sent | | |||
07/30/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
07/27/2001 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
07/27/2001 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
07/09/2001 | Notice to appellant that brief is late | | |||
06/20/2001 | Brief Due | | |||
05/21/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
05/14/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
05/07/2001 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
05/04/2001 | Motion Received | | |||
05/01/2001 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/23/2001 | Notice to clerk that record is late | | |||
04/23/2001 | Notice to reporter that record is late | | |||
04/19/2001 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
04/18/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
04/18/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
04/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
03/06/2001 | Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed | | |||
03/03/2001 | Record due | | |||
02/27/2001 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/14/2019 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
James W.brown & Deville Homes | Appellee | Stuart C. Cox |
Lanetta Williams | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Dallas Court Reporter, 68th District Court |
Johnny Spencer | Appellant | Johnny Spencer |
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
00-07557-C