Case Information: 83-CV-0037 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSON, OLIVIA EUGENE H. PHIFER COMPANY | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LT68834-82 | Filed Date: | 01/18/1983 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/18/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/12/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/26/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/19/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | Olivia Johnson | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | JOHNSON, OLIVIA EUGENE H. PHIFER COMPANY | |||
01/01/1906 | BUNNR PRO BONO COUNSEL | |||
01/18/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/12/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/26/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
12/19/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
12/29/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |