Case Heading (S-18-0137) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0137 | Case Docketed On: | 06/11/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | JOSHUA C. OSBAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | JOSHUA C. OSBAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Joshua C. Osban | Scott Mitchel Guthrie |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens Caitlin Frances Harper Russell Winslow Farr |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop, Criminal Law -Speedy Trial |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 43 |
Citation: | 439 P.3d 739 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
06/11/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
06/11/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
06/11/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
06/11/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement and service of orders to Scott Mitchel Guthrie | Notice-Outgoing | E-filing requirement | Final | |
07/24/2018 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
07/27/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/27/2018 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
08/21/2018 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
08/27/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/08/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
10/10/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/15/2018 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
10/23/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received from Caitlin Harper obo appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
10/23/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Scott Mitchel Guthrie obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
10/23/2018 | Brief - Appellant Reply | Brief | Petitioner reply | Final | |
10/24/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/26/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/02/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes 1-2, Original Papers; Volume 3, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume 4, Transcripts (13); Volume 5, Confidential Folder; Volume 6, Exhibits. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/09/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance (Russell Farr obo Appellee) | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
11/13/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance (Russell Farr obo Appellee) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/13/2018 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Scott Mitchel Guthrie o/b/o Appellant; Russell Farr o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
04/19/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing and remanding with Justice Fox writing for the Court. Justice Kautz filed a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Boomgaarden joined. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/07/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/10/2019 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 05/09/2019 by Andrea Reed | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |