judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES, ETIM E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HACKERS'

Case Information: 86-AA-0467
Short Caption:JAMES, ETIM E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HACKERS'Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/20/1986

Opening Event Date:03/20/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/12/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerEtim E. James NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
George C. Valentine YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JAMES, ETIM E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HACKERS' LICENSE APPEAL BOARD
03/20/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/12/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/26/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/22/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/24/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition