Case Information: 39034 | |||
Short Caption: | TANTEW (NICKY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177748 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/07/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 02-00399 | |
01/07/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/26/01; 11/28/01 and 12/3/01. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. Filed in district court on: January 2, 2002. | 02-00400 | |
01/09/2002 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 11/26/01; 11/28/01; and 12/03/01. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 02-00554 | |
02/06/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 02-02430 | |
02/06/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 02-02431 | |
02/25/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 02-03480 | |
03/14/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-04590 | |
04/09/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-04870 | |
04/09/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/25/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. | 02-04870 |