judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITTAKER, JR. (LARRY) VS. STATE C/W 33542

Case Information: 34037
Short Caption:WHITTAKER, JR. (LARRY) VS. STATE C/W 33542Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33542 *, 34037Related Case(s): 36817
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C111381Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/13/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-02875
05/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 33949, 34037, 34077, 34092, 34100, 34101, 34123. 99-04116
09/13/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 99-08584
09/13/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 33518, 33575. Document No. 00-12158.
08/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13817
08/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13817