Case Heading (S-18-0138) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0138 | Case Docketed On: | 06/11/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Sweetwater County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7) | ||
Short Title: | EDWARD CHRISTOPHER BARROWES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | EDWARD CHRISTOPHER BARROWES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Edward Christopher Barrowes | Diane M. Lozano Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens Caitlin Frances Harper Jessica Yvonne Frint |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Constitutional Law - Federal, Criminal Law -Sentencing |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 8 |
Citation: | 432 P.3d 1261 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
06/11/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
06/11/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
06/11/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
07/30/2018 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
07/31/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/13/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
09/14/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of designation of record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/21/2018 | Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
10/01/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/02/2018 | Order - Assigning to brief only docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
10/08/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
10/08/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes 1-2, Original Papers; Volume 3, Confidential Folder; Volume 4, Redaction Sleeve; Volume 5, Transcripts - containing 11 total. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/18/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Chief Justice Davis writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
02/05/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
02/05/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
02/05/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
02/05/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
02/19/2019 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Received by Hollie Bramwell 2/3/19 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |