judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER CO. V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION

Case Information: 79-AA-1073
Short Caption:POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER CO. V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission
Lead: 79-AA-1037 Consolidated:79-AA-1073
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/25/1979

Opening Event Date:10/25/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/18/1981
Argued/Submitted:04/09/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Frederick D. Dorsey YN
PetitionerPotomac Electric Power CompanyN
Zoe A. Bush NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
RespondentD.C. Public Service CommissionN
Howard C. Davenport NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
William D. Shapiro NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER CO. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION
10/25/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/14/1980PETITIONER'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1980FiledRecord Completed
01/13/1981AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF (PEOPLE'S COUNSEL) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1981FiledBriefing Completed
02/18/1981RESPONDENT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1981PETITIONER'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/09/1981ARGUED PANELNKMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1982MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1986RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1986ORDER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1987PTNR MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOTO 2/27/87 PB TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1987PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 022787 SCHPRD SMA
01/28/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE ON REG CAL AS SPECIAL SITTING ON 3/18/88 AT 10:00 A.M. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012188 SCHPRD VS
03/11/1988PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (PEPCO) (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO. OF PEPCO TO WITHDRAW APPEAL AND DISMISSING THIS APPEAL SL PANELPY SCDATE 031888 SCHPRD CREG
03/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
04/11/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD