judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PHENIX (RAYMOND) VS. STATEC/W 33543/34063

Case Information: 34601
Short Caption:PHENIX (RAYMOND) VS. STATEC/W 33543/34063Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33543 *, 34063 , 34601Related Case(s): 33476 , 33543 , 34063 , 39467 , 39832 , 40730 , 42890 , 50410 , 66928 , 68061 , 68061-COA , 70554 , 70554-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C107053Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/29/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07070
08/10/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. The record shall only contain the documents filed in the district court between May 10, 1999, the date appellant filed his motion, and July 23, 1999, the date the district court denied the motion. 99-07391
11/29/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 11/23/99. 99-11820
11/29/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/28/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Supplements to Authorities of Record on Appeal, and Motion to Expedite and Submit for Decision. (Nos. 33543, 34063 and 34601).
03/30/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to file in Propria Persona and Appointment of Counsel for Oral Arguments. (Nos. 33543, 34063 and 34601).
11/01/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Supplement to Existing Arguments in Record on Appeal with New Points and Authorities. (Nos. 33543, 34063 and 34601).
04/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED in Docket Nos. 33543 and 34063 and DISMISS the appeal in Docket No. 34601. fn26[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 33543/34063/34601. 01-06183
05/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06299
05/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2001. 01-06299