judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL DECKER v. WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0051)
Case Number:S-07-0051Case Docketed On:03/06/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:DANIEL DECKER v. WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: DANIEL DECKER, Appellant (Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel DeckerWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich
John William Renneisen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 100
Citation:191 P.3d 105

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/06/2007Event - Docketed and indexed.EventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/06/2007Fees - Docket fee received.FeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/16/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
04/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/25/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/25/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/14/2007Brief - Appellees; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/18/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/21/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/27/2007Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Norman E. Young to act in this matter, and recusing Justice Burke.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
07/02/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/11/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/27/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court. Justice Kite files a dissenting opinion in which Chief Justice Voigt joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/03/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
09/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received - combined application and motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs, affidavit supporting same and notice of objectionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/24/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/30/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/29/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal