judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1553
B-1553
05/19/1969
Application for Writ of Error
EARL E. BUSBY
MARY LOU BUSBY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/20/1969Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/10/1969Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
06/05/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/29/1970Dissenting opinion issued.
07/29/1970Opinion issued
10/20/1969Response to Brief filed
10/10/1969Brief on the Merits
07/23/1969Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1969Response to Petition
05/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Earl E. BusbyPetitioner
Mary Lou BusbyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information