judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS (EUGENE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31947
Short Caption:LEWIS (EUGENE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C120618Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/13/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/09/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
03/12/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31899, 31901, 31936, 31938, 31947, 31948, 31950.
07/13/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
07/13/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Having reviewed the record on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09948
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11880
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-11880