judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

W.N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO. v. COMMUNITY FIRST INSURANCE, INC. WYOMING, a Wyoming corporation; BW INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.; and OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation

Case Heading (06-271)
Case Number:06-271Case Docketed On:11/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:W.N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO. v. COMMUNITY FIRST INSURANCE, INC. WYOMING, a Wyoming corporation; BW INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.; and OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Full Title:W.N. McMURRY CONSTRUCTION CO., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. COMMUNITY FIRST INSURANCE, INC. WYOMING, a Wyoming corporation; BW INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.; and OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantW.N. McMurry Construction Co.Weston W. Reeves
AppelleeCommunity First Insurance, Inc. WyomingRichard Alan Mincer
Billie LM Addleman
AppelleeBW Insurance Agency, Inc.Richard Alan Mincer
Billie LM Addleman
AppelleeOhio Casualty Insurance CompanyPatrick J. Murphy
Ryan Justin Schwartz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 96
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
11/30/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/30/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
12/04/2006Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
01/12/2007Brief - Appellant, appendix to brief; and received copy of brief on disk and of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
02/28/2007Brief - Appellee Ohio Casualty Insurance Company; and received copy on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
02/28/2007Brief - Appellee BW Insurance AGency, Inc.; and received copy of designation of record. Received copy of brief on disk on 03/09/07.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/08/2007Brief - Appellant reply; and received copy on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volumes I, II, III, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/24/2007Event - Oral argument presented. (Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke (W.W. Reeves for appellant; Patrick Murphy and Richard Mincer for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/15/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/03/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal