judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAYMOND F. BOSWELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-1299
Short Caption:RAYMOND F. BOSWELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:81-CF-1299Consolidated: 81-CF-1522
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F187-81Filed Date:09/24/1981

Opening Event Date:09/24/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/20/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/24/1983
Argued/Submitted:06/16/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRaymond F. Boswell YPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOSWELL, RAYMOND F. UNITED STATES
09/24/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1982FiledRecord Completed
03/24/1983FiledBriefing Completed
06/16/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/14/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition