Case Heading (S-18-0110) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0110 | Case Docketed On: | 04/30/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Uinta County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury | ||
Short Title: | SCOTT OLDROYD v. TADGE KANJO, M.D. | ||||
Full Title: | SCOTT OLDROYD, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TADGE KANJO, M.D., Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Scott Oldroyd | Jeffrey Clay Shorter |
Appellee | Tadge Kanjo MD | James E. Phillips |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Civil Procedure, Limitation of Actions |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 1 |
Citation: | 432 P.3d 879 (Wyo. 2019) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/30/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/30/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/30/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
04/30/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
04/30/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement and service of orders to Jeffrey Clay Shorter | Notice-Outgoing | E-filing requirement | Final | |
04/30/2018 | Order - Sanction - notice of appeal | Order | Sanction - notice of appeal | Final | |
05/07/2018 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/08/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/11/2018 | Fees - Sanctions received - NOA | Fees | Sanctions received - NOA | Final | |
06/06/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
06/07/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/15/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (copy of Appellant's) | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
06/19/2018 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
06/20/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/20/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/28/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
06/28/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume. Volume 1 - Original Papers (2 folders) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/28/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
07/02/2018 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
07/13/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jeffrey Shorter o/b/o Scott Oldroyd | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
07/23/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from James E. Phillips obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
08/16/2018 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Burke, Fox, Kautz and Boomgaarden (Jeffrey C. Shorter o/b/o Appellant; James E. Phillips o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
10/09/2018 | Order - Other - Notice of Reassignment Following Retirement (Burke) | Order | Other | Final | |
01/07/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing and remanding with Justice Kautz writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
01/23/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
01/23/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
01/23/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
01/23/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
01/28/2019 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Received by Mary Wren 1/25/2019 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |