judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HIGHER ACHIEVEMENT PROGRAM DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC

Case Information: 86-AA-0394
Short Caption:HIGHER ACHIEVEMENT PROGRAM DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLICClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/12/1986

Opening Event Date:03/12/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/28/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/29/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/20/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Philip L. O'DonoghueYY
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Julia L. O'Brien NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Karen S. Dworkin YN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HIGHER ACHIEVEMENT PROGRAM DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC SCHOOLS
03/12/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/28/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/29/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/20/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/03/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition