judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHEL VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34082
Short Caption:MICHEL VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A396008Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/22/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Your Legal Power--check no. 3318.
04/22/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibtion, Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief from Orders of the District Court Denying Petitioner's Motion for Discharge from Interpleader, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Discharge from Interpleader; Motion to Strike Untimely Answer and Counterclaim; and, Order Granting Motion to Set Aside Default. 99-03169
04/22/1999Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidaivit of Herbert L. Michel, Jr., in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibtion, Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief from Orders of the District Court Denying Petitioner's Motion for Discharge from Interpleader, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Discharge from Interpleader; Motion to Strike Untimely Answer and Counterclaim; and, Order Granting Motion to Set Aside Default. 99-03170
04/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibtion, Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief from Orders of the District Court Denying Petitioner's Motion for Discharge from Interpleader, Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Discharge from Interpleader; Motion to Strike Untimely Answer and Counterclaim; and, Order Granting Motion to Set Aside Default. 99-03171
02/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real parties in interest: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[Yolanda Cervantes, however, may not file an answer in this court because she is in proper person and the court has not granted her leave to file papers in this court.] It appears that real party in interest Preferred Chiropractic represents itself in proper person in these proceedings. Preferred Chiropractice shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain counsel to represent it in this proceeding, and to enter counsel's appearance with the clerk of this court. 00-02059
03/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. and Joinders. Robert M. Ebinger as counsel for Real Party in Interest Preferred Chiropractic. 00-03727
03/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Association of Counsel and Motion for Extension of Time in Which to file Answer Against Issuance of Writ. 00-03932
03/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. DISN and Preferred Chiropractic shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file their answers. fn1[Yoland Cervantes may not file an answer in this court because she is in proper person and the court has not granted her leave to file papers in this court.] 00-04534
04/25/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Answer against Issuance of Writ (Second Request). 00-06656
04/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. DISN has filed another motion for an extension of time, requesting an extension until May 22, 2000. The motion is granted in part, and DISN shall have until May 10, 2000, to file its answer. 00-06977
05/12/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Answer against Issuance of Writ (Third Request). 00-07944
05/15/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Petitioner's Opposition to Motion of Real Party in Interest Diagnostice Imaging of Southern Nevada for Third Extension of Time in which to file an Answer Against Issuance of Writ. 00-08054
05/15/2000MotionFiled Motion. Petitioner's Motion for Permission to Supplement Appendix and Petition for Writ of Prohibition, Mandamus or Other Appropriate, Relief, etc. 00-08055
05/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. DISN shall have until May 19, 2000, to file its answer. We warn DISN that no further extensions will be permitted. If DISN fails to file an answer on that date, this court will treat that failure as a confession of error. In addition, if DISN fails to file a timely answer, or requests another extension of time, DISN must show cause why sanctions should not be imposed on its counsel. fn1[The court will defer ruling on petitioner's motion for permission to supplement the petition until a later date.] 00-08298
05/22/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer Against Issuance of Writ. 00-08520
06/02/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioner's Motion for Permission to File Reply Brief. 00-09308
06/02/2000Petition/WritReceived Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioner's [proposed] Reply Brief and Affidavit of Herbert L. Michel, Jr. in Support Thereof. 00-09309
06/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On May 15, 2000, petitioner filed a motion for permission to supplement his petition for a writ of prohibition or mandamus, and this court received the proposed supplement. The motion is granted, and the clerk of the court shall file the supplement submitted on May 15, 2000. 00-09392
06/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Supplemental Affidavit of Herbert L. Michel, Jr., in Support of appendix and Petition for Writ of Prohibition, Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief, etc. 00-08056
06/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On June 2, 2000, petitioner filed a moiton for permission to file a reply in support of his petition. The motion is granted, and the clerk of the court shall file the reply submitted on June 2, 2000. 00-10623
06/21/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioner's Reply Brief and Affidavit of Herbert L. Michel, Jr. in Support Thereof. 00-09309
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-20543
11/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-1 (CY/RR/NB).
02/22/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition denied." Before Young, Rose and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 16. SNP00A-1 01-03299
03/09/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Your Legal Power-check no. 5573.
03/09/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 3/8/01. 01-04301
04/05/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-05809
04/23/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-06031
04/23/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.