Case Information: 85-BG-0673 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: MARK A. SUCHER | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 04/25/1985 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/25/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/26/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/26/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/26/1987 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Petitioner | Bar Counsel | N |
| ||||||||||||
Petitioner | Board on Professional Responsibility | N |
| ||||||||||||
Respondent | Mark A. Sucher | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SUCHER, MARK A. IN RE: | |||
04/25/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/26/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/26/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/26/1987 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/30/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |