judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CATOE, RODWELL M. WASHINGTON, WALTER E.

Case Information: 84-CV-0713
Short Caption:CATOE, RODWELL M. WASHINGTON, WALTER E.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA2355-78Filed Date:05/23/1984

Opening Event Date:05/23/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/11/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/23/1987
Argued/Submitted:06/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paulette B. Peltz NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Harry Alexander NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
James P. Wheeler YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert E. Greenberg YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Donald A. Thigpen NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Edward E. SchwabYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CATOE, RODWELL M. ET AL WASHINGTON, WALTER E. ET AL
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 030287 ORD: GRANT APLE MO TO NOTE - 01 EXT TM TO FL BRF AFTER TRIAL NOTE - 02 EXHIBITS ARE FILED & APLE TO NOTE - 02 ADVISE THIS CRT IN 20 DAYS IN NOTE - 03 THE EVENT THE EXHIBITS ARE NOT NOTE - 03 OBTAINED SO THAT FURTHER ACTN NOTE - 04 MAY BE INITIATED. NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/06/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WHEELERJ FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - SCHWABE FOR - APPELLEES
01/01/1906 ALEXANDERH WITHDRAWN 6/11/86
05/23/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/07/1984CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 060784 SCHPRD CAS
06/07/1984$25 DOCKETING FEE PAID SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1984$25 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1984ORDER NO 7A; APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DR/SRT & SERVE COPIES CMJ PANELNW SCDATE 061884 SCHPRD CHECK
07/13/1984DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND SRT GG PANEL SCDATE 071384 SCHPRD DR
11/01/1984ORDER APLTS IN 10 DAYS OTSC-DISMISS (NO RECORD) CMJ PANELPY SCDATE 091384 SCHPRD R
11/13/1984APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER SL PANEL SCDATE 111384 SCHPRD ANSA
11/23/1984RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 11/1/84 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1984RECORD ON APPEAL (DEPOSITIONS) GG IN LRC #5, DRAWER #2 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1984ORDER APLT BRIEF DUE 40 DAYS AFTER FILING OF SWARINGER'S TRANSCRIPT - CMJ PANELPY SCDATE 112384 SCHPRD CHECK
05/07/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT HARRY T. ALEXANDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (SUPPLEMENTAL) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (472 PGS - SWARINGER; 278 PGS - SCHERTZER) GG PANEL SCDATE 062786 SCHPRD RT
08/11/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/19/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 092286 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 8TH JB PANEL SCDATE 102186 SCHPRD BE
10/29/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APLE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 102986 SCHPRD OPA
11/06/1986ORDER APLE'S BRIEF DUE 12/8/86; NFX TTC PANELPY SCDATE 111086 SCHPRD CHECK
12/05/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER TRIAL EXHIBITS ARE FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 120886 SCHPRD BE
12/08/1986RECEIVED APPELLEE'S STATE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 121786 SCHPRD OPA
03/02/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 010687 SCHPRD RBH
03/24/1987APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MARCH 2ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD ANSE
08/27/1987RECEIVED 1 BOX OF EXHIBITS (SURVEYS, ETC.) MLH PANEL SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/27/1987RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF APPEL- LEE CONCERNING EXHIBITS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1987ORDER IT APPEARING SAID EXHIBITS HAVE BEEN FILED, BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 2ND (CORP COUNSEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 102987 SCHPRD BE
11/04/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF PB DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/23/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL ADVIS- ING THE COURT OF WHO WILL ARGUE CASE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/07/1988ARGUED PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/19/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD