Case Information: 34104 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. DIST CT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33871 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Esmeralda Co. - Fifth Judicial District - 694 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/14/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/26/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/26/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 99-03286 | |
04/26/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | 99-03287 | |
06/01/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. | 99-04541 | |
06/14/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer and Points and Authorities of Real Party in Interest, Tracey Lynn Hill, in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 99-05080 | |
08/05/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Supplement to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 99-07224 | |
10/14/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this original proceeding shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada panel as of the date of this order. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 99-09987 | |
10/14/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. This original proceeding shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel this day. | ||
11/02/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Substiution of Attorneys - Statement of Relevant Facts. | 99-10719 | |
12/20/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 99-12863 | |
01/18/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-00664 | |
01/18/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |