Case Information: 33072 | |||
Short Caption: | RAMOS (JUAN) VS. STATE C/W 33519, 34475, 34840 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 33072*, 33519 , 34475 , 34840 | Related Case(s): | 33519 , 34475 , 34840 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138615 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/12/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/28/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/28/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
11/10/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. [Fn1- The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 31628, 31831, 33072, 33104, 33121, 33139, 33210, 33227. | ||
02/08/1999 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Request Leave from the Court to File Opening Brief. (Original and 2 copies--1 returned to appellant.) | ||
03/12/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 3/10/99. | ||
03/12/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/12/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm these orders of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 33072 c/w 33519, 34475, 34840. | 01-00731 | |
02/07/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-00807 | |
02/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/08/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2001. | 01-00807 |