judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HABIB, NATHAN THURSTON, MARIE

Case Information: 84-CV-0636
Short Caption:HABIB, NATHAN THURSTON, MARIEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Lead: 84-CV-0355 Consolidated:84-CV-0636
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT77391-83Filed Date:05/15/1984

Opening Event Date:05/15/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/07/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/21/1984
Argued/Submitted:06/17/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantJohn Doe N
Philip M. MusolinoNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John C. Schaible NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Peter G. Drymalski NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joan Politeo YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HABIB, NATHAN THURSTON, MARIE
05/15/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1984FiledRecord Completed
11/21/1984FiledBriefing Completed
06/17/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/30/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition