judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6736
B-6736
04/29/1977
Application for Writ of Error
FRED HERRON, ET AL.
H. L. LACKEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/12/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/26/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
04/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/19/1977Response to Motion filed
08/12/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/27/1977Opinion issued
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/27/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/15/1977Letter Filed
06/09/1977Motion to amend application for writ of error
05/26/1977Response to Petition
05/25/1977Response to Petition
05/16/1977Extension of time to file app writ err filedFiling granted
04/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed
04/29/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fred Herron, et al.Petitioner
H. L. LackeyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information