judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YOW (ALMA V.) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36188
Short Caption:YOW (ALMA V.) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C166541Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. and Request for Stay of Execution. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-08977
06/05/2000Other Other. After further review it has been determined that this is a criminal matter. A filing fee is not required.
06/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order entered 5/19/00. Due Date: 10 days
06/23/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 19, 2000. 00-10786
07/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court has determined that a response from the State would assist this court in resolving this appeal. Accordingly, the State shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to advise this court of the current status of the extradition proceedings, whether the proceedings have been stayed pursuant to NRS 34.560(2), or whether appellant has been extradited to the State of Alabama. 00-11587
09/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The State has failed to respond to our order of July 7, 2000. The State shall within 10 days from the date of this order advise this court of the current status of the extradition proceedings, whether the proceedings have been stayed, or whether appellant has been extradited to the State of Alabama. 00-15953
09/22/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. State's Response to the Supreme Court's Order of September 11, 2000. 00-16764
10/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant's appeal is moot. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17917
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17965
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17965