judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUKE MICKELSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-156)
Case Number:06-156Case Docketed On:07/05/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Weapons 6-8-101 - 6-8-401
Short Title:LUKE MICKELSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LUKE MICKELSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLuke MickelsonRobert T. Moxley
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 29
Citation:178 P.3d 1080

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/14/2006Brief - Appellant. Counsel attempted to file designation of record, advised it needs to be file in the District Court.BriefAppellantFinal
10/26/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/27/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/07/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/31/2007Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further extensions shall be granted in this caseOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/28/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
03/15/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal (Letter missing from file)Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/22/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I - II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folders; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authority from appellantNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/10/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
04/10/2007Order - Assignment of Judge Nena James, District Judge to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/10/2007Order - Oral argument - amending schedule from April 25, 2007 to April 26, 2007OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/26/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and James, District Judge (Robert T. Moxley for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/05/2007Order - Brief/scheduling - Order requiring additional briefing.OrderBrief/schedulingFinal
09/07/2007Motion - Withdrawal of recordMotionWithdrawal of recordFinal
09/07/2007Order - Other. Order authorizing withdrawal of court record.OrderOtherFinal
09/07/2007System - Record checked-out. Checked out by the Attorney General's Office.SystemRecord checked-outFinal
09/21/2007Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
09/21/2007Order - Grant - stipulated order to supplement the recordOrderGrantFinal
10/02/2007System - Record checked-in - from AG's office.SystemRecord checked-inFinal
10/18/2007Brief - Supplemental appelleeBriefSupplemental appelleeFinal
10/19/2007Brief - Supplemental appellantBriefSupplemental appellantFinal
10/30/2007Order - Other. Order following supplemental briefing.OrderOtherFinal
03/17/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court. District Judge James files a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal