judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY D. ARNOLD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0203
Short Caption:BOBBY D. ARNOLD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:81-CF-0203Consolidated: 82-CF-1157
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2388-78Filed Date:01/22/1981

Opening Event Date:01/22/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/18/1983
Argued/Submitted:07/14/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBobby D. Arnold N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Craig N. MooreYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ARNOLD, BOBBY D. UNITED STATES
01/22/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1982FiledRecord Completed
05/18/1983FiledBriefing Completed
07/14/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/31/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition