judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6726
B-6726
04/26/1977
Application for Writ of Error
T.L. JAMES AND COMPANY, INC. AND R. W. MCKINNEY
FOREST STATHAM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/29/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/10/1977Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/07/1977Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/16/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/10/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/01/1977Reply to Response
11/29/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/28/1977Opinion issued
11/10/1977Response to Brief filed
11/07/1977Supplemental Brief filed
07/13/1977Document received (See Remarks)
05/16/1977Reply to Response
05/10/1977Response to Petition
04/26/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T.L. James and Company, Inc. and R. W. McKinneyPetitioner
Forest StathamRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information