Case Information: 39103 | |||
Short Caption: | GOITOM (MESFUN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CVHC0031649 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/22/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/22/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 02-01476 | |
03/01/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Fast Track Statement and appendix. Corrected due: 10 days. | ||
03/11/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 02-04386 | |
03/11/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 02-04388 | |
03/22/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 02-05164 | |
04/01/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Counsel for appellant shall have 5 days within which to file and serve a rough draft transcript request form in accordance with NRAP 3C(d)(3) requesting the transcript of the evidentiary hearing conducted on December 7, 2001. | 02-05741 | |
04/12/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 7, 2001. Court Reporter: Tia Lane. Filed in district court on: January 18, 2002. | 02-06593 | |
05/16/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The rough draft transcript requests were filed in the district court on January 18, 2002, and the requested transcripts are therefore several months overdue. Court reporter or recorder Tia Lane shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. | 02-08686 | |
05/22/2002 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: December 7, 2001 (2) Court Reporter: Tia H. Lange. | 02-08971 | |
09/09/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 02-15449 | |
10/04/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-15519 | |
10/04/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/21/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 15, 2002. | 02-15519 |