judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6738
B-6738
05/02/1977
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM WESLEY WILLIAMS, JR., INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF ESTATE OF WILLIAM WESLEY WILLIAMS, SR. AND GENEVA WILLIAMS CANTON
MILDRED DISCH WILLIAMS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1978Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/15/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/25/1977Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/17/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
05/02/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/10/1978Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/06/1978Motion to dismiss
06/15/1978Motion for Rehearing
05/31/1978Dissenting opinion issued.
05/31/1978Opinion issued
10/25/1977Supplemental Brief filed
07/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
07/20/1977Document received (See Remarks)
06/29/1977Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
05/17/1977Response to Petition
05/06/1977Conditional application for writ of error filedFiling granted
05/02/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/02/1977Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mildred Disch WilliamsRespondent
Robert Edwin Davis and Bruce A. BudnerAmicus Curiae
William Wesley Williams, Jr., Independent Executor of Estate of William Wesley Williams, Sr. and Geneva Williams CantonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information