Case Information: 83-CV-0881 | |||
Short Caption: | MOORE, CALVIN L. AXELROD AND WAGNER | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Lead: | 83-CV-0881 | Consolidated: | 83-CV-0882 , 83-CV-0883 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 07/13/1983 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/13/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 12/29/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/05/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MOORE, CALVIN L. AXELROD AND WAGNER | |||
01/01/1906 | MINERG FOR ZIMMER & FLIPPEN | |||
07/13/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
12/29/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/05/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
06/28/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |