judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AXELROD AND WAGNER MOORE, CALVIN

Case Information: 83-CV-0882
Short Caption:AXELROD AND WAGNER MOORE, CALVINClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Lead: 83-CV-0881 Consolidated:83-CV-0882, 83-CV-0883
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/25/1983

Opening Event Date:07/25/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/05/1984
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Martin F. McMahonNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
George H. Windsor NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Gregory J. Miner NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AXELROD AND WAGNER MOORE, CALVIN ET AL
07/25/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1983FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1984FiledBriefing Completed
06/28/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition