judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WALLACE, KATHERINE WAREHOUSE EMPLOYEES UNION #730

Case Information: 83-CV-0885
Short Caption:WALLACE, KATHERINE WAREHOUSE EMPLOYEES UNION #730Classification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/28/1983

Opening Event Date:07/28/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/23/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/05/1984
Argued/Submitted:04/26/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
T. Clarence Harper NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Hugh J. Beins NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Mooney NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALLACE, KATHERINE ET AL WAREHOUSE EMPLOYEES UNION #730
07/28/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/23/1983FiledRecord Completed
01/05/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/26/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/12/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition