judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOMINIQUE, VERNON KAISER

Case Information: 83-CV-0884
Short Caption:DOMINIQUE, VERNON KAISERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/22/1983

Opening Event Date:07/22/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/16/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/08/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/26/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William D. Foote NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOMINIQUE, VERNON ET AL KAISER ET AL
07/22/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1983FiledRecord Completed
12/08/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/26/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/23/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition