Case Information: 34111 | |||
Short Caption: | E.W. BUILT VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34074 , 34182 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9704829 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/27/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of James Shields Beasley, Esq.--check no. 1289. | ||
04/27/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandate and Motion for Emergency Stay. | 99-03325 | |
04/27/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger. | ||
04/29/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[This court will not rule on petitioner's motion to stay the district court proceeding until such time as it has received and reviewed the real party in interest's answer to the petition]. | 99-03410 | |
05/10/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. (to file response to petition). | 99-03790 | |
05/14/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate and Motion for Emergency Stay. | 99-03965 | |
05/20/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition and petitioner's concomitant emergency motion for a stay." SNP99A-RR/DA/NB | 99-04157 | |
05/20/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Disapproved. The Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure do not provide for parties to stipulate to extend the time for filing any document other than a brief. Nevertheless, the answer to the petition having been timely filed, the stipulation is disapproved as moot. | 99-04184 | |
06/15/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 99-05141 | |
06/15/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Diloreto's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandate. (Answer was timely received on 05/13/99 but inadvertently not filed). | 99-03931 |