judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Keller, Clifton Alton v. Texas, The State of

Case: 09-81-00135-CR
09-81-00135-CR
11/24/1981
Burglary
Keller, Clifton Alton
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/09/1982Mandate Issued
09/22/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/11/1982Brief Filed
03/02/1982Brief Filed
01/29/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1981Statement of Facts Filed
11/24/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
39542
16 Years