judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT TROY DUNSMORE v. AMY JO DUNSMORE

Case Heading (06-263)
Case Number:06-263Case Docketed On:11/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ROBERT TROY DUNSMORE v. AMY JO DUNSMORE
Full Title:ROBERT TROY DUNSMORE, Appellant (Defendant), v. AMY JO DUNSMORE, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert Troy DunsmoreMitchell E. Osborn
AppelleeAmy Jo DunsmorePhilip White Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 202
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/03/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/08/2007Correspondence - Incoming - Received letter from Mr. Pretty indicating that he had been allowed to withdraw in the district court and has not been retained by appellee for appeal. Brought appellee's situation to Court's attention.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/09/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - Sent letter to appellee requesting address for service of briefs and pleadings.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
01/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/01/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellee. Appearance of counsel for appellee noted.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/09/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and designation of record on appeal (has Supreme Court heading, but contacted counsel who indicated it was filed in district court.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/23/2007Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; volume IV, confidential folder; volume V, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/7/08 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal