judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MURPHY, EDWARD JACKSON, LEROY A.

Case Information: 80-CV-1433
Short Caption:MURPHY, EDWARD JACKSON, LEROY A.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA11141-78Filed Date:12/03/1980

Opening Event Date:12/03/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/03/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/16/1983
Argued/Submitted:02/21/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James L. Stafford NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MURPHY, EDWARD JACKSON, LEROY A.
12/03/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/03/1983FiledRecord Completed
11/16/1983FiledBriefing Completed
02/21/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/29/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition