judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HARVEY RENGER, M. D. v. HON. M. C. JEFFREY, JUDGE OF THE DISTRICT COURT OF FAYETTE COUNTY, TEXAS, AUGUST MACHICEK AND WIFE, MARY MACHICEK

Case: A-204
A-204
06/01/1944
MISC PETITION
HARVEY RENGER, M. D.
HON. M. C. JEFFREY, JUDGE OF THE DISTRICT COURT OF FAYETTE COUNTY, TEXAS, AUGUST MACHICEK AND WIFE, MARY MACHICEK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/11/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/21/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
06/20/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/20/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/30/1944Letter Filed
10/11/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/21/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/20/1944Response to Petition
06/20/1944Response to Petition
06/14/1944Order of the Court Issued
06/09/1944Letter Filed
06/07/1944Petition for ___ filed
06/01/1944Bond
06/01/1944Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
August Machicek and wife, Mary MachicekRespondent
Harvey Renger, M. D.Relator
Hon. M. C. Jeffrey, Judge of the District Court of Fayette County, TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information