Case Information: 36961 | |||
Short Caption: | SANDS VS. SANDS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D205263 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/06/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
11/06/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-19464 | |
11/06/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/12/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[Appellant failed to pay the filiing fee required by NRS 2.250, but submitted a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The motion is denied as moot in light of this order. Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 00-21664 | |
01/08/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/09/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. 02/22/01 Order Denying Rehearing: We hereby recall the remittitur for the limited purpose of ruling upon appellant's petition for rehearing. | 00-21810 | |
01/09/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/22/2001 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "ORDER the petition for rehearing DENIED." fn5[Although appellant was not granted leave to appear in proper person, we have nevertheless considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We note that appellant failed to pay the filing fee for his petition for rehearing, and this constitutes an independent basis for denial of the petition. On January 9, 2001, the clerk of this court inadvertently issued the remittitur in this appeal. We hereby recall the remittitur for the limited purpose of ruling upon appellant's petition for rehearing.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-03331 | |
02/27/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. | 00-21810 | |
03/12/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-03688 | |
03/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/22/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. | 01-03688 |