Case Heading (S-17-0186) | |||||
Parent: | S-17-0186 | Case Docketed On: | 08/03/2017 | ||
Consolidated: | S-17-0187 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Sweetwater County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | DANIEL JAMES BOUTIN, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | DANIEL JAMES BOUTIN, SR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Daniel James Boutin Sr. | Pro Se |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law |
Opinion Number: | 2017 WY 145 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/03/2017 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/03/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/03/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/03/2017 | Order - Consolidating cases | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
09/14/2017 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
09/15/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/15/2017 | Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
10/03/2017 | Brief - Anders | Brief | Anders | Final | |
10/03/2017 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
10/03/2017 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
10/04/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967); Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; and Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/04/2017 | Record - Received unfiled record from Public Defender. Two volumes, original papers and transcript. | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
10/04/2017 | Order - Grant Anders Extension pro se brief | Order | Grant Anders Extension pro se brief | Final | |
10/09/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Change of address | Final | |
10/10/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Change of Address (Re-mailed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief to new address) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/27/2017 | Failure to File - Brief of appellant - pro se (Defendant is not incarcerated) | Failure to File | Brief of appellant - pro se | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Order Affirming the District Court's Judgment and Sentence | Opinion | Published order | Final | |
12/29/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
12/29/2017 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
12/29/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
12/29/2017 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
01/08/2018 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - received by B. Bridewell on 1/3/17 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |